NH SB751 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on February 19 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Vacated from Committee and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020 Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 19 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Vacated from Committee and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020 Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to addresses used by domestic violence victims to register to vote.
Title
Relative to addresses used by domestic violence victims to register to vote.
Sponsors
Sen. Martha Fuller Clark [D] | Sen. Martha Hennessey [D] | Sen. Shannon Chandley [D] | Sen. Jeanne Dietsch [D] |
Sen. Jeb Bradley [R] | Sen. Jay Kahn [D] | Rep. Marjorie Smith [D] | Rep. Robert Cushing [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-16 | Senate | Vacated from Committee and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020 Senate Journal 8 |
2020-03-11 | Senate | ==CANCELLED== Hearing: 03/18/2020, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 09:30 am; Senate Calendar 11 |
2020-02-25 | Senate | ==CANCELLED== Hearing: 03/11/2020, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 10:30 am; Senate Calendar 8 |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Introduced 02/13/2020 and Referred to Election Law and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 5 |