NH SB75 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-11-12 - Committee report: Refer to Interim Study for Jan 6 (Vote 13-4; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 67, PG. 14
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-11-12 - Committee report: Refer to Interim Study for Jan 6 (Vote 13-4; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 67, PG. 14
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to unfair trade practices targeting veterans.
Title
Relative to unfair trade practices targeting veterans.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-12 - Senate - Ought to Pass (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-11-12 | House | Committee report: Refer to Interim Study for Jan 6 (Vote 13-4; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 67, PG. 14 |
2015-09-29 | House | Executive Session: 10/27/2015 1:15 PM Legislative Office Building 302 |
2015-09-28 | House | Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 10/27/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 |
2015-05-19 | House | Retained in Committee |
2015-05-13 | House | Executive Session: 5/19/2015 1:15 PM Legislative Office Building 302 |
2015-05-07 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 5/12/2015 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 |
2015-04-29 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 5/7/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 |
2015-03-25 | House | Public Hearing: 4/2/2015 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 |
2015-03-12 | House | Introduced and Referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs; House Journal 26, PG. 1275 |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Regular Calendar 24Y-0N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 8 |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Sen. Bradley Moved Reconsideration on Ought to Pass, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 8 |
2015-03-12 | Senate | The Chair Recinded OT3rdg; Senate Journal 8 |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 8 |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 3/12/15; Senate Calendar 12 |
2015-02-20 | Senate | Hearing: === RESCHEDULED === 3/3/15, Room 100, State House, 1:20 p.m.; Senate Calendar 11 |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Hearing:===CANCELLED=== 2/17/15, Room 100, State House, 1:20 p.m.; Senate Calendar 8 |
2015-01-08 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 4 |