NH SB748 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Placed on Laid on Table Consent List and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Placed on Laid on Table Consent List and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Repealing certain inactive dedicated funds.
Title
Repealing certain inactive dedicated funds.
Sponsors
Sen. Bob Giuda [R] | Sen. Jeanne Dietsch [D] | Rep. Norman Major [R] | Rep. Susan Almy [D] |
Rep. Patricia Lovejoy [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-16 | Senate | Placed on Laid on Table Consent List and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8 |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass Senate Calendar 11 |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Hearing: 03/10/2020, Room 103, State House, 01:15 pm; Senate Calendar 10 |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Introduced 02/13/2020 and Referred to Finance; Senate Journal 5 |