NH SB747 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Placed on Laid on Table Consent List and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Placed on Laid on Table Consent List and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing the department of education to accept and expend certain federal funds for the purpose of increasing, expanding, or replicating the number of charter schools in the state.
Title
Authorizing the department of education to accept and expend certain federal funds for the purpose of increasing, expanding, or replicating the number of charter schools in the state.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-16 | Senate | Placed on Laid on Table Consent List and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8 |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2020-1138s Senate Calendar 11 |
2020-02-14 | Senate | ===ROOM CHANGE=== Hearing: 02/18/2020, Representatives' Hall, State House, 01:00 pm; Senate Calendar 7 |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Introduced 02/06/2020 and Referred to Finance; Senate Journal 4 |