NH SB74 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-15 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 34, PG. 1559
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-15 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 34, PG. 1559
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a committee to study reducing the cost of county government.
Title
Establishing a committee to study reducing the cost of county government.
Sponsors
Sen. Martha Fuller Clark [D] | Rep. Jane Beaulieu [D] | Rep. David Danielson [R] | Sen. Andy Sanborn [R] |
Rep. Franklin Sterling [R] | Sen. Lou D'Allesandro [D] | Rep. Marjorie Smith [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-02-19 - Senate - Ought to Pass with Amendment (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-15 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 34, PG. 1559 |
2015-03-27 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Apr 15 (Vote 11-4; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 29, PG. 1309 |
2015-03-17 | House | Executive Session: 3/26/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 301 |
2015-03-17 | House | Public Hearing: 3/24/2015 10:45 Amendment Legislative Office Building 301 |
2015-03-04 | House | Introduced and Referred to Municipal and County Government; House Journal 22, PG. 629 |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0338s, Regular Calendar 24Y-0N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 6 |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Committee Amendment 0338s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Sen. Fuller Clark Moved to Remove SB 74 from the Consent Calendar |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-0338s, 2/19/15; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 10 |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Hearing: 2/11/15, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 11:15 a.m.; Senate Calendar 9 |
2015-01-08 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Public and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 4 |