NH SB735 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-05 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 03/05/2020; Senate Journal 5
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-05 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 03/05/2020; Senate Journal 5
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Repealing the housing appeals board.
Title
Repealing the housing appeals board.
Sponsors
Sen. Regina Birdsell [R] | Sen. Thomas Sherman [D] | Sen. Jeanne Dietsch [D] | Sen. Ruth Ward [R] |
Rep. John O'Connor [R] | Rep. Barbara Griffin [R] | Rep. Jess Edwards [R] | Rep. Linda Gould [R] |
Rep. David Milz [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-05 | Senate | Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 03/05/2020; Senate Journal 5 |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 03/05/2020; Senate Calendar 9 |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Hearing: 01/28/2020, Room 100, State House, 09:55 am; Senate Calendar 4 |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Introduced 01/08/2020 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 2 |