NH SB732 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Placed on Laid on Table Consent List and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Placed on Laid on Table Consent List and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibiting the sharing of location data.
Title
Prohibiting the sharing of location data.
Sponsors
Sen. Shannon Chandley [D] | Rep. Kurt Wuelper [R] | Rep. Marjorie Smith [D] | Rep. Robert Cushing [D] |
Rep. Carol McGuire [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-16 | Senate | Placed on Laid on Table Consent List and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8 |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2020-1030s Senate Journal 7 |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Special Order to 03/19/2020, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 03/12/2020 Senate Journal 7 |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Special Order to 03/12/2020, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 03/11/2020 Senate Journal 6 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2020-1030s, 03/11/2020; Senate Calendar 10 |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Hearing: 02/11/2020, Room 100, State House, 09:40 am; Senate Calendar 6 |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Introduced 01/08/2020 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 2 |