NH SB731 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Placed on Laid on Table Consent List and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Placed on Laid on Table Consent List and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to foster family assistance and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Relative to foster family assistance and making an appropriation therefor.
Sponsors
Sen. Jay Kahn [D] | Sen. Melanie Levesque [D] | Sen. Martha Fuller Clark [D] | Sen. David Watters [D] |
Sen. John Reagan [R] | Sen. Jeb Bradley [R] | Sen. Dan Feltes [D] | Rep. Jerry Knirk [D] |
Rep. Joelle Martin [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-16 | Senate | Placed on Laid on Table Consent List and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8 |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2020-1133s Senate Calendar 11 |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2020-0606s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 02/13/2020; Senate Journal 4 |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2020-0606s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/13/2020; Senate Journal 4 |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2020-0606s, 02/13/2020; Senate Calendar 6A |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Hearing: 01/28/2020, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 03:40 pm; Senate Calendar 4 |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Introduced 01/08/2020 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 2 |