NH SB73 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-01-21 - Remote Hearing: 01/28/2021, 09:00 am; Links to join the hearing can be found in the Senate Calendar; Senate Calendar 8
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Establishing a green building standards initiative as part of the low or moderate income housing loan program and making an appropriation therefor; and establishing a commission to study green housing and utility source options.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a green building standards initiative as part of the low or moderate income housing loan program and making an appropriation therefor; and establishing a commission to study green housing and utility source options.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-21SenateRemote Hearing: 01/28/2021, 09:00 am; Links to join the hearing can be found in the Senate Calendar; Senate Calendar 8
2021-01-19SenateIntroduced 01/06/2021 and Referred to Finance; Senate Journal 3

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback