NH SB73 | 2018 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB73

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-01-03 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/03/2018 House Journal 1 P. 40
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to septic requirements in conversions to accessory dwellings.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to septic requirements in conversions to accessory dwellings.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-03HouseInexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/03/2018 House Journal 1 P. 40
2017-11-09HouseCommittee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 01/03/2018 (Vote 16-0; Consent Calendar)
2017-09-28HouseExecutive Session: 10/18/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 305
2017-08-30HouseRetained Bill Subcommittee Work Session: 09/13/2017 10:10 am Legislative Office Building 305
2017-05-22HouseRetained in Committee
2017-04-26HouseExecutive Session: 05/02/2017 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 305
2017-04-26HouseFull Committee Work Session: 05/02/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 305
2017-04-05HousePublic Hearing: 04/12/2017 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 305
2017-03-23HouseVacated and Referred to Resources, Recreation and Development (Rep. J. Belanger): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/23/2017 House Journal 11 P. 1
2017-03-07HouseIntroduced 02/16/2017 and referred to Municipal and County Government House Journal 8 P. 45
2017-02-23SenateOught to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/23/2017; Senate Journal 7
2017-02-16SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 02/23/2017; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 11
2017-01-19SenateHearing: 01/25/2017, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 09:15 am; Senate Calendar 7
2017-01-18SenateIntroduced 01/05/2017 and Referred to Public and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 4

Same As/Similar To

SB73 (Carry Over) 2017-11-09 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 01/03/2018 (Vote 16-0; Consent Calendar)

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback