NH SB73 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on February 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-16 - Senate Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===, Senate Journal 6, Pg.57
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Failed on February 16 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-16 - Senate Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===, Senate Journal 6, Pg.57
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a committee to study local options for evergreen clauses.
Title
Establishing a committee to study local options for evergreen clauses.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-16 | Senate Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===, Senate Journal 6, Pg.57 | |
2011-02-08 | Senate Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 2/16/2011; Senate Calendar 11 | |
2011-01-27 | Senate Hearing: 2/1/11, Room 100 State House, 10:30 a.m.; Senate Calendar 9 | |
2011-01-19 | Senate Introduced and Referred to Public and Municipal Affairs, Senate Journal 3, Pg.34 |