NH SB72 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 1 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-01 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 48, PG.1663
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on June 1 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-01 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 48, PG.1663
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a comprehensive cancer plan fund.
Title
Establishing a comprehensive cancer plan fund.
Sponsors
Sen. Molly Kelly [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-01 | House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 48, PG.1663 | |
2011-05-24 | House Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass; House Calendar 43, PG.1502 | |
2011-05-24 | House Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for June 1 (Vote 15-5; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 43, PG.1502 | |
2011-05-17 | House Executive Session: 5/24/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 | |
2011-05-10 | House Public Hearing: 5/17/2011 11:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 | |
2011-05-04 | House Referred to Ways and Means; House Journal 42, PG.1420 | |
2011-05-04 | House Ought to Pass with Amendment #1404h(NT): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 42, PG.1419-1420 | |
2011-05-04 | House Amendment #1404h(NT) Adopted, Voice Vote; House Journal 42, PG.1420 | |
2011-04-26 | House Proposed Committee Amendment #2011-1404h (New Title); House Calendar 36, PG.1275 | |
2011-04-26 | House Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #1404h(NT) for May 4 (Vote 16-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 36, PG.1245 | |
2011-04-12 | House Executive Session: 4/26/2011 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 205 | |
2011-03-29 | House Public Hearing: 4/5/2011 10:45 Amendment Legislative Office Building 205 | |
2011-03-28 | House Introduced and Referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs; House Journal 30, PG.1037 | |
2011-03-23 | Senate Passed by Third Reading Resolution; Senate Journal 10, Pg.187 | |
2011-03-23 | Senate Ought to Pass, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 10, Pg.175 | |
2011-03-23 | Senate Sen. Odell Moved Ought to Pass; Senate Journal 10, Pg.175 | |
2011-03-23 | Senate Rereferred to Committee, Motion Failed, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 10, Pg.174 | |
2011-03-11 | Senate Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 3/23/11; Senate Calendar 16 | |
2011-02-23 | Senate Ought to Pass with Amendment 0304s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Refer to Finance Rule 4-3; Senate Journal 7, Pg.72 | |
2011-02-23 | Senate Committee Amendment 0304s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 7, Pg.72 | |
2011-02-14 | Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2011-0304s, 2/23/11; Senate Calendar 12 | |
2011-02-03 | Senate Hearing: 2/10/11, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 1:20 p.m.; Senate Calendar 10 | |
2011-01-19 | Senate Introduced and Referred to Health and Human Services, Senate Journal 3, Pg.34 |