NH SB719 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-05 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 03/05/2020; Senate Journal 5
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-05 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 03/05/2020; Senate Journal 5
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to lost or stolen firearms.
Title
Relative to lost or stolen firearms.
Sponsors
Sen. David Watters [D] | Sen. Martha Fuller Clark [D] | Sen. Martha Hennessey [D] | Rep. Katherine Rogers [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-05 | Senate | Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 03/05/2020; Senate Journal 5 |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 03/05/2020; Senate Calendar 9 |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Hearing: 02/04/2020, Room 100, State House, 10:20 am; Senate Calendar 5 |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Introduced 01/08/2020 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 2 |