NH SB707 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-05 - Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/05/2020; Senate Journal 5
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-05 - Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/05/2020; Senate Journal 5
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to including projects in the ten year transportation improvement plan.
Title
Relative to including projects in the ten year transportation improvement plan.
Sponsors
Sen. Shannon Chandley [D] | Sen. Melanie Levesque [D] | Sen. Cindy Rosenwald [D] | Rep. Kat McGhee [D] |
Rep. Megan Murray [D] | Rep. Michelle St. John [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-05 | Senate | Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/05/2020; Senate Journal 5 |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study, 03/05/2020; Senate Calendar 9 |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Hearing: 02/04/2020, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 02:30 pm; Senate Calendar 4 |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Introduced 01/08/2020 and Referred to Transportation; Senate Journal 2 |