NH SB701 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 15 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Vacated from Committee and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020 Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Vacated from Committee and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020 Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to management of the secure psychiatric unit facility at New Hampshire hospital.
Title
Relative to management of the secure psychiatric unit facility at New Hampshire hospital.
Sponsors
Sen. Harold French [R] | Sen. John Reagan [R] | Sen. Martha Fuller Clark [D] | Sen. David Watters [D] |
Sen. Lou D'Allesandro [D] | Sen. Sharon Carson [R] | Sen. Thomas Sherman [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-16 | Senate | Vacated from Committee and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020 Senate Journal 8 |
2020-02-20 | Senate | ==CANCELLED== Hearing: 03/17/2020, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 02:15 pm; Senate Calendar 11 |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Introduced 01/08/2020 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 2 |