NH SB70 | 2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Foward to future SB70

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-11 - Rereferred to Committee, Regular Calendar 24Y-0N, Motion Adopted; 03/11/2021; Senate Journal 7
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to insurance coverage for emergency behavioral health services for children and young adults.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to insurance coverage for emergency behavioral health services for children and young adults.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-11 - Senate - Rereferred (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-11SenateRereferred to Committee, Regular Calendar 24Y-0N, Motion Adopted; 03/11/2021; Senate Journal 7
2021-03-02SenateCommittee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 03/11/2021; Senate Calendar 14
2021-02-03SenateRemote Hearing: 02/08/2021, 01:30 pm; Links to join the hearing can be found in the Senate Calendar; Senate Calendar 10
2021-01-19SenateIntroduced 01/06/2021 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 3

Same As/Similar To

SB70 (Carry Over) 2021-03-11 - Rereferred to Committee, Regular Calendar 24Y-0N, Motion Adopted; 03/11/2021; Senate Journal 7

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback