NH SB70 | 2020 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB70

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-08 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/08/2020 House Journal 1 P. 40
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to vacancies among primary candidates and prohibiting a candidate from receiving the nomination of more than one party.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to vacancies among primary candidates and prohibiting a candidate from receiving the nomination of more than one party.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-08HouseInexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/08/2020 House Journal 1 P. 40
2019-11-08HouseCommittee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 50 P. 7
2019-10-04HouseExecutive Session: 10/31/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 308
2019-09-25HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 10/03/2019 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 308
2019-05-16HouseRetained in Committee
2019-05-01HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 05/07/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 308
2019-04-30House==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 05/16/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 308
2019-04-16House==RECESSED== Executive Session: 04/25/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 308
2019-04-02HousePublic Hearing: 04/10/2019 02:30 pm Legislative Office Building 308
2019-04-01HouseIntroduced 03/20/2019 and referred to Election Law House Journal 11 P. 73
2019-03-28SenateOught to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/28/2019; Senate Journal 11
2019-03-20SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/28/2019; Senate Calendar 15
2019-03-12SenateHearing: 03/20/2019, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 10:00 am; Senate Calendar 14
2019-01-17SenateIntroduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Election Law and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 4

Same As/Similar To

SB70 (Carry Over) 2019-11-08 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar)

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback