NH SB70 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-16 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 02/16/2017; Senate Journal 6
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to disclosure of expert testimony in civil cases.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to disclosure of expert testimony in civil cases.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-02-16SenateInexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 02/16/2017; Senate Journal 6
2017-02-09SenateCommittee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 02/16/2017; Senate Calendar 10
2017-01-19SenateHearing: 01/24/2017, Room 100, State House, 10:20 am; Senate Calendar 7
2017-01-18SenateIntroduced 01/05/2017 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 4

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback