NH SB70 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-11 - Signed by the Governor on 06/05/2015; Chapter 0101; Effective 01/01/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the processing of lobster tails.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the processing of lobster tails.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-11SenateSigned by the Governor on 06/05/2015; Chapter 0101; Effective 01/01/2016
2015-05-13SenateEnrolled (In recess 5/7/2015); Senate Journal 14
2015-05-06HouseEnrolled; House Journal 41, PG. 1779
2015-04-30SenateSen. Birdsell Concurs with House Amendment #1206h, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 12
2015-04-15HouseOught to Pass with Amendment #1206h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 34, PG. 1539
2015-04-15HouseAmendment #1206h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 34, PG. 1539
2015-04-08HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-1206h for Apr 15 (Vote 11-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 29, PG. 1303
2015-03-26HouseExecutive Session: 3/31/2015 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 307
2015-03-26HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 3/31/2015 10:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 307
2015-03-11HousePublic Hearing: 3/19/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 307
2015-03-04HouseIntroduced and Referred to Fish and Game and Marine Resources; House Journal 22, PG. 629
2015-02-12SenateOught to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 5
2015-01-30SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 2/12/15; Senate Calendar 9
2015-01-20SenateHearing:=== TIME CHANGE === 1/28/15, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 12:00 p.m.; Senate Calendar 7
2015-01-08SenateIntroduced and Referred to Public and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 4

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback