NH SB70 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-30 - Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote;
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-30 - Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote;
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the appointment of insurance agents and repealing a fee for insurance producers.
Title
Relative to the appointment of insurance agents and repealing a fee for insurance producers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-30 | Senate | Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; |
2014-01-22 | Senate | Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study, 1/30/14; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 4 |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 5 |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 2/14/13; Senate Calendar 8 |
2013-01-30 | Senate | Hearing: 2/7/13, Room 100, State House, 1:00 p.m.; Senate Calendar 7 |
2013-01-03 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 4 |