NH SB70 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-14 - Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 5
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the appointment of insurance agents and repealing a fee for insurance producers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the appointment of insurance agents and repealing a fee for insurance producers.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-02-14SenateRereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 5
2013-02-07SenateCommittee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 2/14/13; Senate Calendar 8
2013-01-30SenateHearing: 2/7/13, Room 100, State House, 1:00 p.m.; Senate Calendar 7
2013-01-03SenateIntroduced and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 4

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback