NH SB70 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 13 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-13 - Senate Signed by the Governor on 07/13/11; Chapter 0247
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to remedies in landlord-tenant actions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to remedies in landlord-tenant actions.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-07-13 Senate Signed by the Governor on 07/13/11; Chapter 0247
2011-06-22 Senate Enrolled
2011-06-22 House Enrolled; House Journal 57, PG.1859
2011-06-22 Senate Conference Committee Report 2464c; Adopted, Voice Vote
2011-06-22 House Conference Committee Report #2464c Adopted, Voice Vote; House Journal 57, PG.1808
2011-06-16 House Conference Committee Report #2011-2464c, House Amendment + New Amendment, Filed; House Calendar 49, PG.1674
2011-06-09 Senate Committee of Conference Meeting: 6/15/2011, 9:00 a.m., Room 100, State House
2011-06-08 House Speaker Appoints: Reps Giuda, Sorg, McClarren, and Rowe; House Journal 51, PG.1724
2011-06-08 House House Accedes to Senate Request for C of C (Rep Rowe): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 51, PG.1724
2011-06-08 Senate President Appoints: Senators Prescott, De Blois and D’Allesandro; Senate Journal 20, Pg.548
2011-06-08 Senate Sen. Prescott Moved Nonconcur with House Amendment 1405h; Requests C of C, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 20, Pg.548
2011-06-01 House Ought to Pass with Amendment #1405h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 48, PG.1648-1649
2011-06-01 House Amendment #1405h Adopted, Division Vote 266-86; House Journal 48, PG.1648-1649
2011-05-26 House Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass; House Calendar 43, PG.1499-1500
2011-05-26 House Proposed Majority Committee Amendment #2011-1405h; House Calendar 43, PG.1513
2011-05-26 House Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #1405h for June 1 (Vote 10-5; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 43, PG.1499-1500
2011-05-10 House Executive Session: 5/24/2011 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 208 ==TIME CHANGE (Orig 10:00 Amendment)==
2011-03-29 House Public Hearing: 4/12/2011 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 208
2011-03-17 House Introduced and Referred to Judiciary; House Journal 30, PG.1036
2011-03-16 Senate Passed by Third Reading Resolution; Senate Journal 9, Pg.161
2011-03-16 Senate Ought to Pass with Amendment 0866s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 9, Pg.104
2011-03-16 Senate Sen. Houde Floor Amendment #2011-0866s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 9, Pg.104
2011-03-16 Senate Sen. De Blois moved Ought to Pass; Senate Journal 9, Pg.104
2011-03-16 Senate Rereferred to Committee, Motion Failed, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 9, Pg.104
2011-03-08 Senate Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 3/16/11; Senate Calendar 15
2011-02-17 Senate Hearing: 2/25/11, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 9:30 a.m.; Senate Calendar 12
2011-02-03 Senate Introduced and Referred to Commerce, Senate Journal 5, Pg.44

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback