NH SB694 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Vacated from Committee and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020 Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Vacated from Committee and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020 Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to recommended minimum cybersecurity standards for municipalities and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Relative to recommended minimum cybersecurity standards for municipalities and making an appropriation therefor.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeanne Dietsch [D] | Sen. Melanie Levesque [D] | Sen. Shannon Chandley [D] | Sen. Cindy Rosenwald [D] |
Rep. Jon Morgan [D] | Rep. Karen Ebel [D] | Rep. Chris Balch [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-16 | Senate | Vacated from Committee and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020 Senate Journal 8 |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2020-1091s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 03/12/2020; Senate Journal 7 |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2020-1091s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/12/2020; Senate Journal 7 |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Special Order to 03/12/2020, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 03/11/2020 Senate Journal 6 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2020-1091s, 03/11/2020; Senate Calendar 10 |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Hearing: 02/12/2020, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 09:30 am; Senate Calendar 6 |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Introduced 01/08/2020 and Referred to Election Law and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 2 |