NH SB687 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 30 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-23 - Died on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 30 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-23 - Died on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to transparency in prescription drug pricing and establishing a New Hampshire prescription drug affordability board.
Title
Relative to transparency in prescription drug pricing and establishing a New Hampshire prescription drug affordability board.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-23 | House | Died on Table |
2020-06-30 | House | Introduced and Laid on Table Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/30/2020 House Journal 10 P. 6 |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2020-1062s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/11/2020; Senate Journal 6 |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2020-1062s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/11/2020; Senate Journal 6 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2020-1062s, 03/11/2020; Senate Calendar 10 |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Hearing: 01/21/2020, Room 100, State House, 01:45 pm; Senate Calendar 3 |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced 01/08/2020 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 2 |