NH SB686 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-3)
Status: Engrossed on June 30 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-23 - Died on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 30 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-23 - Died on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to prescription drug benefits paid by health plans and establishing the New Hampshire prescription drug competitive marketplace.
Title
Relative to prescription drug benefits paid by health plans and establishing the New Hampshire prescription drug competitive marketplace.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-11 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-23 | House | Died on Table |
2020-06-30 | House | Introduced and Laid on Table Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/30/2020 House Journal 10 P. 6 |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2020-1063s, Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 03/11/2020; Senate Journal 6 |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2020-1063s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/11/2020; Senate Journal 6 |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Sen. Carson Withdraws the motion to divide the Question; 03/11/2020; Senate Journal 6 |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Sen. Carson Moved to divide the Question on Committee Amendment #2020-1063s: Sections 1, 2 and 5 I, and Sections 3, 4 and 5, II; 03/11/2020; Senate Journal 6 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2020-1063s, 03/11/2020; Senate Calendar 10 |
2020-01-24 | Senate | ==RECONVENE== Hearing: 01/28/2020, Room 100, State House, 01:00 pm; Senate Calendar 4 |
2020-01-16 | Senate | ==RECESSED== Hearing: 01/21/2020, Room 100, State House, 02:15 pm; Senate Calendar 3 |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced 01/08/2020 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 2 |