NH SB685 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-3)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-06-16 - Vacated from Committee and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020 Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishing a wholesale prescription drug importation program and establishing the New Hampshire prescription drug competitive marketplace.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a wholesale prescription drug importation program and establishing the New Hampshire prescription drug competitive marketplace.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-12 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-16SenateVacated from Committee and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020 Senate Journal 8
2020-03-12SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2020-1074s, Regular Calendar 24Y-0N, Motion Adopted; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 03/12/2020; Senate Journal 7
2020-03-12SenateCommittee Amendment # 2020-1074s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/12/2020; Senate Journal 7
2020-03-11SenateSpecial Order to 03/12/2020, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 03/11/2020 Senate Journal 6
2020-03-11SenateSen. Morse Moved to Remove SB 685 from the Consent Calendar; 03/11/2020; Senate Journal 6
2020-03-04SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2020-1074s, 03/11/2020; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 10
2020-01-16SenateHearing: 01/21/2020, Room 100, State House, 01:00 pm; Senate Calendar 3
2020-01-14SenateIntroduced 01/08/2020 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 2

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback