NH SB674 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-23 - Died on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-23 - Died on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the special fund for domestic violence programs, the public health services special fund, and the mosquito control fund.
Title
Relative to the special fund for domestic violence programs, the public health services special fund, and the mosquito control fund.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-23 | House | Died on Table |
2020-06-30 | House | Vacated and Laid on Table Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/30/2020 House Journal 10 P. 5 |
2020-03-02 | House | Introduced 02/20/2020 and referred to Ways and Means House Journal 5 P. 56 |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 02/06/2020; Senate Journal 3 |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 02/06/2020; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 5 |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Hearing: 01/28/2020, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 03:00 pm; Senate Calendar 4 |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced 01/08/2020 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 2 |