NH SB671 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-05 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 03/05/2020; Senate Journal 5
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-05 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 03/05/2020; Senate Journal 5
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to nursing home standards.
Title
Relative to nursing home standards.
Sponsors
Sen. Ruth Ward [R] | Sen. Thomas Sherman [D] | Sen. James Gray [R] | Sen. Shannon Chandley [D] |
Sen. John Reagan [R] | Sen. Bob Giuda [R] | Sen. Regina Birdsell [R] | Sen. Jeb Bradley [R] |
Rep. John Potucek [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-05 | Senate | Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 03/05/2020; Senate Journal 5 |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; 03/05/2020; Senate Calendar 9 |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Hearing: 01/21/2020, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 02:20 pm; Senate Calendar 3 |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced 01/08/2020 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 2 |