NH SB66 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-13 - Signed by the Governor on 07/09/2021; Chapter 0117; Effective 07/09/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-13 - Signed by the Governor on 07/09/2021; Chapter 0117; Effective 07/09/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allowing on-premises licensees to transport beverages and wines for delivery to consumers.
Title
Allowing on-premises licensees to transport beverages and wines for delivery to consumers.
Sponsors
Sen. Harold French [R] | Sen. Sharon Carson [R] | Sen. Kevin Cavanaugh [D] | Sen. Bob Giuda [R] |
Sen. Cindy Rosenwald [D] | Sen. Kevin Avard [R] | Sen. Suzanne Prentiss [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-13 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 07/09/2021; Chapter 0117; Effective 07/09/2021 |
2021-07-01 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 06/24/2021 |
2021-07-01 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 06/24/2021); Senate Journal 20 |
2021-06-10 | Senate | Sen. French Moved to Concur with the House Amendment, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/10/2021; Senate Journal 19 |
2021-06-03 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2021-1495h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/03/2021 House Journal 8 P. 4 |
2021-06-03 | House | Amendment # 2021-1495h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 06/03/2021 House Journal 8 P. 4 |
2021-05-25 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-1495h (Vote 17-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 26 P. 4 |
2021-05-18 | House | ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 05/25/2021 10:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/94122935505 |
2021-05-05 | House | ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 05/13/2021 10:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/93883325643 |
2021-03-23 | House | Public Hearing: 03/23/2021 10:30 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/97167243328 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-03-10 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 02/25/2021 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 4 P. 48 |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2021-0458s, Regular Calendar 23Y-1N, Amendment Adopted; 03/04/2021; Senate Journal 6 |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2021-0458s, Regular Calendar 23Y-1N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 03/04/2021; Senate Journal 6 |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-0458s, 03/04/2021; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 12 |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Remote Hearing: 02/16/2021, 09:00 am; Links to join the hearing can be found in the Senate Calendar; Senate Calendar 11 |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Introduced 01/06/2021 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 3 |