NH SB65 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-11-06 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the start of the school year.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the start of the school year.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-11-06SenateCommittee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
2019-02-14SenateSen. Kahn Moved to Rerefer, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/14/2019; Senate Journal 5
2019-02-14SenateSen. Kahn Moved to Remove SB 65 from the Consent Calendar; 02/14/2019; Senate Journal 5
2019-02-06SenateCommittee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; 02/14/2019; Senate Calendar 10
2019-01-23SenateHearing: 01/29/2019, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 10:45 am; Senate Calendar 8
2019-01-17SenateIntroduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Education and Workforce Development; Senate Journal 4

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback