NH SB65 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-08 - Signed by the Governor on 05/07/2015; Chapter 0030; Effective 07/06/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-08 - Signed by the Governor on 05/07/2015; Chapter 0030; Effective 07/06/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Adding a judicial branch employee member to the deferred compensation commission.
Title
Adding a judicial branch employee member to the deferred compensation commission.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Woodburn [D] | Sen. Donna Soucy [D] | Rep. Stephen Shurtleff [D] | Sen. Sam Cataldo [R] |
Rep. John Sytek [R] | Sen. Sharon Carson [R] | Sen. John Reagan [R] | Rep. Jacalyn Cilley [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-08 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 05/07/2015; Chapter 0030; Effective 07/06/2015 |
2015-04-29 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 4/9/2015); Senate Journal 12 |
2015-04-29 | House | Enrolled; House Journal 36, PG. 1597 |
2015-04-15 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 34, PG. 1538 |
2015-04-08 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for Apr 15 (Vote 13-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 29, PG. 1303 |
2015-03-18 | House | Executive Session: 3/24/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306 |
2015-03-11 | House | Public Hearing: 3/17/2015 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 306 |
2015-03-04 | House | Introduced and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; House Journal 22, PG. 629 |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 5 |
2015-01-30 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 2/12/15; Senate Calendar 9 |
2015-01-14 | Senate | Hearing: 1/22/15, Room 100, State House, 2:20 p.m.; Senate Calendar 6 |
2015-01-08 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 4 |