NH SB65 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-14 - Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 7
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-14 - Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 7
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to energy efficiency plans of gas and electric distribution companies.
Title
Relative to energy efficiency plans of gas and electric distribution companies.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-14 | Senate | Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 7 |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 3/14/13; Senate Calendar 11 |
2013-02-12 | Senate | Hearing: 2/20/13, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 9:00 a.m.; Senate Calendar 9 |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Energy & Natural Resources; Senate Journal 5 |