NH SB640 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-13 - Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/13/2020; Senate Journal 4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-13 - Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/13/2020; Senate Journal 4
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the art fund administered by the council on the arts.
Title
Relative to the art fund administered by the council on the arts.
Sponsors
Sen. Martha Fuller Clark [D] | Sen. Shannon Chandley [D] | Sen. Jay Kahn [D] | Rep. David Danielson [R] |
Rep. Matthew Wilhelm [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-13 | Senate | Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/13/2020; Senate Journal 4 |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study, 02/13/2020; Senate Calendar 6 |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Hearing: 01/28/2020, Room 103, State House, 01:15 pm; Senate Calendar 4 |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced 01/08/2020 and Referred to Finance; Senate Journal 2 |