NH SB64 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-11-12 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-1308h (NT) for Jan 6 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 67, PG. 4-5
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 31 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-11-12 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-1308h (NT) for Jan 6 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 67, PG. 4-5
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to rulemaking authority and enforcement concerning prices for filling certain prescriptions.
Title
Relative to rulemaking authority and enforcement concerning prices for filling certain prescriptions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-11-12 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-1308h (NT) for Jan 6 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 67, PG. 4-5 |
2015-09-29 | House | Executive Session: 10/27/2015 1:15 PM Legislative Office Building 302 |
2015-09-29 | House | Retained Bill - Subcommittee Work Session: 10/13/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 |
2015-05-19 | House | Retained in Committee |
2015-05-13 | House | ==RESCHEDULED== Work Session: 5/19/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2015-05-13 | House | ==RESCHEDULED== Work Session: 5/19/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 301 |
2015-05-13 | House | Executive Session: 5/19/2015 1:15 PM Legislative Office Building 302 |
2015-05-12 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 5/19/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 |
2015-04-28 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 5/5/2015 1:15 PM Legislative Office Building 302 |
2015-04-07 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 4/8/2015 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 302 |
2015-04-02 | House | Public Hearing: 4/8/2015 11:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 |
2015-04-01 | House | Referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs; House Journal 31, PG. 1477 |
2015-04-01 | House | Vacate (Rep Kotowski): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 31, PG. 1477 |
2015-03-31 | House | Introduced and Referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs (in recess of 3/25/2015); House Journal 28, PG. 1299 |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0977s, New Title, and 1107s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 10 |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Sen. Sanborn Floor Amendment #2015-1107s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 10 |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Committee Amendment 0977s, New Title, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2015-0977s, New Title, 3/26/15; Senate Calendar 14 |
2015-01-15 | Senate | Hearing: 1/20/15, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 1:20 p.m.; Senate Calendar 6 |
2015-01-08 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 4 |