NH SB64 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-20 - Signed by the Governor on 06/20/2013; Chapter 0091; Effective 08/19/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-20 - Signed by the Governor on 06/20/2013; Chapter 0091; Effective 08/19/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to public informational meetings on dams.
Title
Relative to public informational meetings on dams.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-20 | Senate | Signed by the Governor on 06/20/2013; Chapter 0091; Effective 08/19/2013 |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Enrolled 5/2/13 |
2013-05-08 | House | Enrolled; House Journal 41, PG.1424 |
2013-05-08 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 41, PG.1402 |
2013-04-23 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for May 8 (Vote 13-3; Regular Calendar); House Calendar36, PG.1203 |
2013-04-10 | House | Executive Session: 4/16/2013 10:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 305 |
2013-04-03 | House | Public Hearing: 4/9/2013 10:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 305 |
2013-03-27 | House | Introduced and Referred to Resources, Recreation and Development; House Journal 31, PG.1074 |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0253s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 5 |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Committee Amendment 0253s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2013-0253s, 2/14/13; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 8 |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Hearing: 1/30/13, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 9:15 a.m.; Senate Calendar 6 |
2013-01-03 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 4 |