NH SB635 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Placed on Laid on Table Consent List and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Placed on Laid on Table Consent List and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing the lakes region development authority.
Title
Establishing the lakes region development authority.
Sponsors
Sen. Charles Morse [R] | Sen. Harold French [R] | Rep. Peter Spanos [R] | Rep. Charlie St. Clair [D] |
Rep. Patricia Lovejoy [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-16 | Senate | Placed on Laid on Table Consent List and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8 |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2020-1123s Senate Calendar 11 |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 01/30/2020; Senate Journal 2 |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 01/30/2020; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 4 |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Hearing: 01/22/2020, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 09:35 am; Senate Calendar 3 |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced 01/08/2020 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 2 |