NH SB629 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Placed on Laid on Table Consent List and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Placed on Laid on Table Consent List and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing the solid waste reduction management fund and establishing a solid waste disposal surcharge.
Title
Establishing the solid waste reduction management fund and establishing a solid waste disposal surcharge.
Sponsors
Sen. David Watters [D] | Sen. Regina Birdsell [R] | Sen. Martha Fuller Clark [D] | Sen. Jay Kahn [D] |
Rep. Karen Ebel [D] | Rep. John O'Connor [R] | Rep. Megan Murray [D] | Rep. Dan Wolf [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-16 | Senate | Placed on Laid on Table Consent List and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8 |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2020-1055s Senate Calendar 11 |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Special Order to 03/19/2020, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 03/12/2020 Senate Journal 7 |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Special Order to 03/12/2020, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 03/11/2020 Senate Journal 6 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2020-1055s, 03/11/2020; Senate Calendar 10 |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Hearing: 02/04/2020, Room 103, State House, 09:45 am; Senate Calendar 5 |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced 01/08/2020 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 2 |