NH SB626 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 30 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-23 - Died on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 30 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-09-23 - Died on Table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Decreasing the fee to file a petition for a declaratory ruling with the site evaluation committee.
Title
Decreasing the fee to file a petition for a declaratory ruling with the site evaluation committee.
Sponsors
Sen. Ruth Ward [R] | Sen. Bob Giuda [R] | Rep. Michael Vose [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-23 | House | Died on Table |
2020-06-30 | House | Introduced and Laid on Table Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/30/2020 House Journal 10 P. 5 |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2020-1031s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/12/2020; Senate Journal 7 |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2020-1031s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/12/2020; Senate Journal 7 |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Special Order to 03/12/2020, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 03/11/2020 Senate Journal 6 |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2020-1031s, 03/11/2020; Senate Calendar 10 |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Hearing: 01/28/2020, Room 103, State House, 09:15 am; Senate Calendar 4 |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced 01/08/2020 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 2 |