NH SB62 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-09 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 02/09/2017; Senate Journal 5
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to rulemaking of the midwifery council on the scope of practice.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to rulemaking of the midwifery council on the scope of practice.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-02-09SenateInexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 02/09/2017; Senate Journal 5
2017-01-27SenateCommittee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 02/09/2017; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 9
2017-01-19SenateHearing: 01/24/2017, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 02:00 pm; Senate Calendar 7
2017-01-18SenateIntroduced 01/05/2017 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 4

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback