NH SB62 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 7 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-07 - Signed by the Governor on 06/07/2013; Chapter 0077; Effective 06/07/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizing the placement of a certain sign in the town of Danbury.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Authorizing the placement of a certain sign in the town of Danbury.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2013-06-07SenateSigned by the Governor on 06/07/2013; Chapter 0077; Effective 06/07/2013
2013-04-24SenateEnrolled 4/18/2013
2013-04-24HouseEnrolled; House Journal 38, PG.1257
2013-04-24HouseOught to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 38, PG.1243
2013-04-17HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass for April 24 (Vote 16-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar33, PG.1095
2013-04-09HouseExecutive Session: 4/16/2013 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 301
2013-04-03HousePublic Hearing: 4/9/2013 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 301
2013-03-27HouseIntroduced and Referred to Municipal and County Government; House Journal 31, PG.1074
2013-02-14SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 0126s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 5
2013-02-14SenateCommittee Amendment 0126s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote
2013-01-31SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2013-0126s, 2/14/13; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 8
2013-01-25SenateHearing: 1/30/13, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 10:00 a.m.; Senate Calendar 6
2013-01-03SenateIntroduced and Referred to Public and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 4

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback