NH SB62 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-19 - Senate Signed by the Governor on 05/16/2011; Effective 07/1/2011; Chapter 0082
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to persons participating in the return to work program.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to persons participating in the return to work program.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-05-19 Senate Signed by the Governor on 05/16/2011; Effective 07/1/2011; Chapter 0082
2011-05-04 Senate Enrolled; Senate Journal 16, Pg.318
2011-05-04 House Enrolled; House Journal 42, PG.1490
2011-04-27 House Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 40, PG.1352
2011-04-21 House Committee Report: Ought to Pass for April 27 (Vote 17-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 33, PG.1066
2011-04-12 House Executive Session: 4/21/2011 1:15 PM Legislative Office Building 302
2011-04-12 House Subcommittee Work Session: 4/21/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 302 Banking/Business Div
2011-03-22 House Public Hearing: 4/12/2011 1:15 PM Legislative Office Building 302 ==Work Session May Follow==
2011-02-16 House Introduced and Referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs; House Journal 19, Pg. 438
2011-02-16 Senate Passed by Third Reading Resolution, Senate Journal 6, Pg.61
2011-02-16 Senate Ought to Pass, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg, Senate Journal 6, Pg.53
2011-02-09 Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 2/16/2011; Senate Calendar 11
2011-02-02 Senate Hearing: 2/8/2011, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 9:45 a.m.; Senate Calendar 10
2011-01-19 Senate Introduced and Referred to Commerce, Senate Journal 3, Pg.34

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback