NH SB61 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB61
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-08 - Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 01/08/2020; Senate Journal 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-08 - Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 01/08/2020; Senate Journal 1
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Permitting private enforcement of the rights of construction and labor industry employees.
Title
Permitting private enforcement of the rights of construction and labor industry employees.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-08 | Senate | Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 01/08/2020; Senate Journal 1 |
2019-11-21 | Senate | Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study, 01/08/2020; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 47 |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Rereferred to Committee, Regular Calendar 15Y-9N, Motion Adopted; 03/28/2019; Senate Journal 11 |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 03/28/2019; Senate Calendar 15 |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Hearing: 03/19/2019, Room 100, State House, 01:15 pm; Senate Calendar 14 |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Introduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 4 |
Same As/Similar To
SB61 (Carry Over) 2019-11-21 - Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar