NH SB61 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-14 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 01/14/2016; Senate Journal 2
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-14 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 01/14/2016; Senate Journal 2
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to funding for the New Hampshire agricultural lands program.
Title
Relative to funding for the New Hampshire agricultural lands program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-14 | Senate | Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 01/14/2016; Senate Journal 2 |
2016-01-07 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 01/14/2016; Senate Calendar 1 |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote, Senate Journal 5 |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 2/12/15; Senate Calendar 9 |
2015-01-20 | Senate | Hearing: 2/3/15, Room 103, State House, 2:20 p.m.; Senate Calendar 7 |
2015-01-08 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Finance; Senate Journal 4 |