NH SB61 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 3 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-14 - Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 7
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-14 - Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 7
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to table stakes poker.
Title
Relative to table stakes poker.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-14 | Senate | Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 7 |
2013-03-06 | Senate | Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 3/14/13; Senate Calendar 11 |
2013-01-29 | Senate | Hearing: 2/5/13, Room 103, State House, 9:15 a.m.; Senate Calendar 7 |
2013-01-03 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Ways & Means; Senate Journal 4 |