NH SB61 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-30 - Senate Sen. Odell Moved Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 11, Pg.195
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-30 - Senate Sen. Odell Moved Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 11, Pg.195
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to capital appropriations to the liquor commission.
Title
Relative to capital appropriations to the liquor commission.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-30 | Senate Sen. Odell Moved Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 11, Pg.195 | |
2011-03-30 | Senate Pending Motion OT3rdg | |
2011-03-30 | Senate Ought to Pass, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 11, Pg.195 | |
2011-03-22 | Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 3/30/11; Senate Calendar 17 | |
2011-03-07 | Senate Hearing: 3/22/11, Room 100, State House, 1:00 p.m.; Senate Calendar 15 | |
2011-01-19 | Senate Introduced and Referred to Capital Budget, Senate Journal 3, Pg.34 |