NH SB60 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-27 - Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/27/2019; Senate Journal 10
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to advance notice to hourly employees of work schedules.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to advance notice to hourly employees of work schedules.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-27SenateRereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/27/2019; Senate Journal 10
2019-03-20SenateCommittee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 03/27/2019; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 15
2019-02-06SenateHearing: 02/12/2019, Room 100, State House, 01:45 pm; Senate Calendar 10
2019-01-17SenateIntroduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Commerce; Senate Journal 4

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback