NH SB6 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-04 - Signed by the Governor on 06/03/2019; Chapter 0043; Effective 06/03/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to child protection staffing and making an appropriation therefor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to child protection staffing and making an appropriation therefor.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-02 - Senate - OTP (Y: 272 N: 87 NV: 18 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-04SenateSigned by the Governor on 06/03/2019; Chapter 0043; Effective 06/03/2019
2019-05-02HouseOught to Pass: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 272-87 05/02/2019 House Journal 14 P. 9
2019-05-14HouseEnrolled 05/08/2019 House Journal 15 P. 100
2019-05-10SenateEnrolled (In recess 05/02/2019); Senate Journal 16
2019-04-17HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass for 05/02/2019 (Vote 16-0; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 22 P. 8
2019-04-10HouseExecutive Session: 04/16/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 206
2019-03-26House==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 04/09/2019 02:30 pm Legislative Office Building 206
2019-03-26House==TIME CHANGE== Public Hearing: 04/09/2019 02:30 pm Legislative Office Building 206
2019-03-11HouseIntroduced 03/07/2019 and referred to Children and Family Law House Journal 8 P. 61
2019-02-14SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2019-0188s, Regular Calendar 23Y-0N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 02/14/2019; Senate Journal 5
2019-02-14SenateCommittee Amendment # 2019-0188s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 02/14/2019; Senate Journal 5
2019-02-04SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2019-0188s, 02/14/2019; Senate Calendar 10
2019-01-17SenateHearing: 01/22/2019, Room 103, State House, 01:30 pm; Senate Calendar 7
2019-01-14SenateIntroduced 01/03/2019 and Referred to Finance; Senate Journal 4

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback