NH SB6 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-3)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-19 - Sen. Bradley Moved Laid On Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote: Senate Journal 6
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-19 - Sen. Bradley Moved Laid On Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote: Senate Journal 6
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Increasing the research and development tax credit against the business profits tax.
Title
Increasing the research and development tax credit against the business profits tax.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-19 - Senate - Ought to Pass (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-19 | Senate | Sen. Bradley Moved Laid On Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote: Senate Journal 6 |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Pending Motion OT3rdg; Senate Journal 6 |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Regular Calendar 24Y-0N, Motion Adopted; Senate Journal 6 |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 2/19/15; Senate Calendar 10 |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Hearing: 2/10/15, Room 103, State House, 9:00 a.m.; Senate Calendar 8 |
2015-01-08 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Ways and Means; Senate Journal 4 |