NH SB593 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on June 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-13 - Notwithstanding the Governor's Veto, Shall SB 593 Become Law: Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Veto Sustained, lacking the necessary two-thirds vote; 09/13/2018; Senate Journal 19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on June 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-09-13 - Notwithstanding the Governor's Veto, Shall SB 593 Become Law: Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Veto Sustained, lacking the necessary two-thirds vote; 09/13/2018; Senate Journal 19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the penalty for capital murder.
Title
Relative to the penalty for capital murder.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-09-13 - Senate - VETO MESSAGE - Roll Call Required (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - House - OTP (Y: 223 N: 116 NV: 17 Abs: 35) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - Senate - Ought to Pass (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-26 - House - OTP (Y: 223 N: 116 NV: 17 Abs: 35) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - Senate - Ought to Pass (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-09-13 | Senate | Notwithstanding the Governor's Veto, Shall SB 593 Become Law: Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Veto Sustained, lacking the necessary two-thirds vote; 09/13/2018; Senate Journal 19 |
2018-06-26 | Senate | Vetoed by Governor 06/21/2018 |
2018-05-09 | House | Enrolled 05/03/2018 |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 05/03/2018); Senate Journal 17 |
2018-04-26 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 223-116 04/26/2018 |
2018-04-19 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2018-04-19 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 04/26/2018 (Vote 12-6; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 16 P. 10 |
2018-04-19 | House | Executive Session: 04/17/2018 Legislative Office Building 204 |
2018-03-27 | House | ==ROOM CHANGE== Public Hearing: 04/04/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2018-03-20 | House | Introduced 03/15/2018 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety House Journal 8 P. 71 |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 03/15/2018; Senate Journal 8 |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/15/2018; Senate Calendar 12A |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Hearing: 03/12/2018, Room 100, State House, 01:00 PM; Senate Calendar 10A |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Introduced 02/15/2018 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 5 |