NH SB59 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-03 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 196-174 06/03/2021 House Journal 8 P. 85
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-03 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 196-174 06/03/2021 House Journal 8 P. 85
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the collaborative care model service delivery method.
Title
Relative to the collaborative care model service delivery method.
Sponsors
Sen. Thomas Sherman [D] | Sen. Jeb Bradley [R] | Sen. Cindy Rosenwald [D] | Rep. William Marsh [D] |
Rep. Gary Woods [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-11 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Committee Amendment 0165s (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Committee Amendment 0165s (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-03 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 196-174 06/03/2021 House Journal 8 P. 85 |
2021-05-26 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2021-05-26 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 10-9; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 26 P. 15 |
2021-05-05 | House | Executive Session: 05/13/2021 10:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/93883325643 |
2021-03-17 | House | Public Hearing: 03/24/2021 10:30 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/97709851457 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-03-10 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 02/25/2021 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 4 P. 48 |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2021-0165s, Regular Calendar 24Y-0N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 02/11/2021; Senate Journal 4 |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2021-0165s, Regular Calendar 24Y-0N, Amendment Adopted; 02/11/2021; Senate Journal 4 |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-0165s, 02/11/2021; Senate Calendar 10 |
2021-01-21 | Senate | Remote Hearing: 01/28/2021, 01:00 pm; Links to join the hearing can be found in the Senate Calendar; Senate Calendar 8 |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Introduced 01/06/2021 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 3 |